OK HB2716 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; Oklahoma Pet Overpopulation Fund; income tax return checkoff; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; Oklahoma Pet Overpopulation Fund; income tax return checkoff; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 11 |
2018-03-08 | House | Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Teague |
2018-03-08 | House | General Order |
2018-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-01 | House | Remove Representative Teague as principal House author and substitute with Representative Echols |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Teague |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |