OK HB2715 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Agriculture; pesticide applicator licenses; modifying prohibited acts; effective date.
Title
Agriculture; pesticide applicator licenses; modifying prohibited acts; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | Approved by Governor 04/23/2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-16 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-16 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 | |
2012-04-16 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-03 | coauthored by Wyrick | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2012-03-06 | First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-05 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-05 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer | |
2012-03-05 | General Order | |
2012-02-23 | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Jackson | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |