OK HB2710 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; requiring retail establishments offering certain cigarette products to comply with certain provisions; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; requiring retail establishments offering certain cigarette products to comply with certain provisions; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-02 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-08 Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
2012-05-03 Sent to Governor
2012-05-03 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2012-05-03 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2012-05-02 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-02 Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 2
2012-05-02 SA's read, adopted
2012-04-11 SA's received
2012-04-11 Engrossed to House
2012-04-10 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-10 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2012-04-10 Title restored
2012-04-10 General Order, Amended
2012-04-10 Senate Rule suspended
2012-03-28 Title stricken
2012-03-28 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
2012-03-15 Second Reading referred to Finance
2012-03-07 First Reading
2012-03-07 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-03-06 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-06 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 5
2012-03-06 General Order
2012-02-29 Emergency added
2012-02-29 Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author)
2012-02-29 Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman
2012-02-29 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2012-02-06 Authored by Representative Jackson
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6836010Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback