OK HB2687 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2687
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hospitals; creating the No Patient Left Alone Act; providing for certain visitation rights, policies and safety protocols; prohibiting certain termination, suspension or waiver of visitation rights; prohibiting certain action against hospital; effective date.
Title
Hospitals; creating the No Patient Left Alone Act; providing for certain visitation rights, policies and safety protocols; prohibiting certain termination, suspension or waiver of visitation rights; prohibiting certain action against hospital; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Toni Hasenbeck [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] | Rep. Ajay Pittman [D] | Rep. Marilyn Stark [R] |
Rep. Tammy Townley [R] | Rep. Brad Boles [R] | Sen. Blake Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Approved by Governor 05/10/2021 |
2021-05-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-05-06 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-05 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2021-05-05 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Stephens |
2021-05-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Townley, Boles |
2021-05-05 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2021-04-20 | House | SA's received |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Title restored |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2021-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 3 |
2021-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2021-03-11 | House | Amended |
2021-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Stark |
2021-03-11 | House | General Order |
2021-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2021-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Hasenbeck |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2687 (Carry Over) 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2021