OK HB2684 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2684
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; reporting method of excise tax on beer; specifying when excise tax for beer sales are due and who they are to be paid by; effective date; emergency.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; reporting method of excise tax on beer; specifying when excise tax for beer sales are due and who they are to be paid by; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2021 |
2021-05-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-05-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-05-26 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2021-05-24 | Senate | CCR read |
2021-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2021-05-24 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 4 |
2021-05-24 | House | CCR adopted |
2021-05-18 | House | Title restored |
2021-05-18 | House | CCR submitted |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Thompson, Rader, Hall, Rosino, Hicks, Kirt |
2021-05-05 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2021-04-19 | House | SA's received |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2021-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 7 |
2021-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-09 | House | General Order |
2021-02-22 | House | Emergency added |
2021-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2684 (Carry Over) 2021-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2021