OK HB2681 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2681
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; Insurance Commissioner qualifications; eliminating financial interest prohibition; effective date.
Title
Insurance; Insurance Commissioner qualifications; eliminating financial interest prohibition; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Marti |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2681 (Carry Over) 2021-02-24 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee