OK HB2680 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2680
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; optometry; scope of practice; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; optometry; scope of practice; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Marti [R] | Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Business and Commerce: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Business and Commerce: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-21 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-02-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 11 |
2021-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis |
2021-02-22 | House | General Order |
2021-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Marti |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2680 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021