OK HB2680 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Corporation Commission; creating the Oklahoma Commercial Motor Carrier (CMC) Safety Enhancement Act; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporation Commission; creating the Oklahoma Commercial Motor Carrier (CMC) Safety Enhancement Act; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-14SenateCoauthored by Representative CrosswhiteHader
2019-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 6
2019-03-12HouseConsidered
2019-03-12HouseLaid over
2019-03-12HouseTitle stricken
2019-03-12HouseAmended
2019-03-12HouseAuthored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
2019-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseEmergency added
2019-02-28HouseRemove Representative Wallace as principal House author and substitute with Representative Frix
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-02-14HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Wallace
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback