OK HB2679 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB2679

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Teacher certification; teacher certification pathways pilot program; provider program requirements; annual report; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher certification; teacher certification pathways pilot program; provider program requirements; annual report; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-26HouseApproved by Governor 06/07/2023
2023-05-26HouseSent to Governor
2023-05-26SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2023-05-26HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2023-05-25HouseReferred for enrollment
2023-05-25SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2023-05-25SenateCCR adopted
2023-05-24SenateCCR read
2023-05-24HouseTo Senate
2023-05-24HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
2023-05-24HouseCCR adopted
2023-05-19HouseCCR submitted
2023-05-18SenateConference granted, SCs named Rader, Pugh, Pemberton, Paxton, Murdock, Dossett
2023-05-18HouseHC's named: Conference Committee on Common Education
2023-05-16HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
2023-05-01HouseSA's received
2023-05-01SenateEngrossed to House
2023-04-27SenateRemove as coauthor Representative(s) Waldron
2023-04-27SenateCoauthored by Senator Daniels
2023-04-27SenateCoauthored by Senator Pederson
2023-04-27SenateCoauthored by Senator Garvin
2023-04-27SenateCoauthored by Senator Newhouse
2023-04-27SenateCoauthored by Senator Stanley
2023-04-27SenateCoauthored by Senator Coleman
2023-04-27SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2023-04-27SenateCoauthored by Senator Thompson (Kristen)
2023-04-27SenateReferred for engrossment
2023-04-27SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2023-04-27SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2023-04-04SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2023-03-30SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2023-03-14SenateCoauthored by Representative Waldron
2023-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
2023-03-13HouseAuthored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
2023-03-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy)
2023-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2023-03-02HouseEmergency added
2023-03-02HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
2023-02-20HouseReferred to Common Education
2023-02-20HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Baker
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2679 (Carry Over) 2023-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2023

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2679&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB2679%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2679%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB2679%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB2679%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/HB2679%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2679%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/hB/HB2679%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2679%20FULLPCS1%20RHONDA%20BAKER-EK.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB2679%20(4-26-23)%20(RADER)%20FS%20FA1.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2679%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2679%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB2679%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2679%20CCR%20A%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2679_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2679_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback