OK HB2678 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance; expanding actions that constitute unfair claims settlement practices; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; expanding actions that constitute unfair claims settlement practices; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19HouseApproved by Governor 04/19/2021
2021-04-13HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-13SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2021-04-13HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2021-04-12HouseReferred for enrollment
2021-04-12SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2021-04-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2021-04-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-04-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2021-04-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2021-03-29SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2021-03-25SenateReferred to Health and Human Services
2021-03-25SenateWithdrawn from Retirement and Insurance committee
2021-03-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Jett
2021-03-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Rader
2021-03-15SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2021-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-09HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-08HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-08HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
2021-03-08HouseAmended
2021-03-08HouseHouse Rule suspended
2021-03-08HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hardin (David), Fugate, Waldron
2021-03-08HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-24HouseAuthored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
2021-02-24HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Mize, Munson, McEntire, Echols, Roberts (Dustin), Pfeiffer, Davis, Frix
2021-02-24HouseCR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Insurance
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Marti
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2678&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB2678%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB2678%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB2678%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB2678%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/hB/HB2678%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2678%20FA1%20MARTITJ-AMM(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2678%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2678%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB2678%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2678_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2678_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback