OK HB2677 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2677
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; pharmacies; Pharmacy Audit Integrity Act; emergency.
Title
Professions and occupations; pharmacies; Pharmacy Audit Integrity Act; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Business and Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Business and Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Approved by Governor 05/04/2021 |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-28 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-27 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-27 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2021-04-26 | House | SA's received |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Garvin |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2021-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-02-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1 |
2021-02-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Trey), Fugate, West (Tammy), Dollens, Davis, Sneed |
2021-02-10 | House | General Order |
2021-02-03 | House | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-03 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Marti |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2677 (Carry Over) 2021-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2021