OK HB2676 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-09 - Conference granted, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-09 - Conference granted, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education; modifying certain eligibility criteria for in-state status for military personnel and their dependents. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Higher education; modifying certain eligibility criteria for in-state status for military personnel and their dependents. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2016-05-05 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2016-04-12 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 6 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-04-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Emergency added |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-07 | House | Emergency not considered |
2016-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin |
2016-03-07 | House | General Order |
2016-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Brooks (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-24 | House | Title stricken |
2016-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-02-15 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee sub-committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Williams |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |