OK HB2675 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB2675

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-04 - Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; creating a task force to study and make recommendations to modernize state graduation requirements; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; creating a task force to study and make recommendations to modernize state graduation requirements; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-04SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2023-03-30SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2023-03-14SenateCoauthored by Representative Staires
2023-03-14SenateCoauthored by Representative Cantrell
2023-03-13SenateCoauthored by Representative Pittman
2023-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-09HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-08HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-08HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 3
2023-03-08HouseAuthored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
2023-03-08HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy)
2023-03-08HouseGeneral Order
2023-02-14HouseCR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Baker
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2675 (Carry Over) 2023-04-04 - Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2675&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB2675%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB2675%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB2675%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/HB2675%20SFLR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2675%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/HB2675%20ENGR%20FI.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2675_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2675_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback