OK HB2669 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2669
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; State Revenue Apportionment Evaluation Commission; membership; organization; duties; report; effective date; emergency.
Title
Public finance; State Revenue Apportionment Evaluation Commission; membership; organization; duties; report; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 68 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Approved by Governor 05/06/2019 |
2019-05-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-01 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-30 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 11 |
2019-04-30 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 20 |
2019-03-07 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2669 (Carry Over) 2019-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2019