OK HB2669 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public finance; State Revenue Apportionment Evaluation Commission; membership; organization; duties; report; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public finance; State Revenue Apportionment Evaluation Commission; membership; organization; duties; report; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 68 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06HouseApproved by Governor 05/06/2019
2019-05-01HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-01SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-01HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-04-30HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-04-30HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 11
2019-04-30HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-24HouseSA's received
2019-04-24SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-23SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-04-23SenateEmergency clause restored
2019-04-23SenateTitle restored
2019-04-23SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-04-23SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2019-04-03SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-04-03SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-03SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 20
2019-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseAuthored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Wallace
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2669&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2669%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2669%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2669%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2669%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2669%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB2669%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2669_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2669_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback