OK HB2669 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Vetoed 05/04/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Vetoed 05/04/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Cemeteries; surveys and plats; modifying recording; effective date.
Title
Cemeteries; surveys and plats; modifying recording; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Vetoed 05/04/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-30 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-26 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-25 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-28 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 4 | |
2012-03-07 | Authored by Senator McAffrey (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-07 | General Order | |
2012-02-09 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Condit | |
2012-02-09 | Remove Representative McAffrey as principal House author and substitute with Representative Dorman | |
2012-02-09 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative McAffrey | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |