OK HB2668 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2668
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; State Bond Advisor; references; Deputy Treasurer for Debt Management; effective date; emergency.
Title
Public finance; State Bond Advisor; references; Deputy Treasurer for Debt Management; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 100 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-04 | House | General Order |
2019-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-14 | House | Remove Representative Wallace as principal House author and substitute with Representative Lepak |
2019-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2668 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee