OK HB2665 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2665
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; enacting the Pass Through Entity Tax Equity Act of 2019; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; enacting the Pass Through Entity Tax Equity Act of 2019; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] | Sen. James Leewright [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] |
Rep. Chris Kannady [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Sen. Casey Murdock [R] | Sen. John Montgomery [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Montgomery |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Murdock |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak |
2019-03-06 | House | General Order |
2019-03-04 | House | Emergency added |
2019-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), Kannady, McBride |
2019-03-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2665 (Carry Over) 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019