OK HB2663 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB2663

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Higher education; in-state tuition eligibility for certain family members and members of the Armed Forces; deleting time limitation for enrollment; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher education; in-state tuition eligibility for certain family members and members of the Armed Forces; deleting time limitation for enrollment; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-26HouseApproved by Governor 06/07/2023
2023-05-26HouseSent to Governor
2023-05-26SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2023-05-26HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2023-05-25HouseReferred for enrollment
2023-05-25SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2023-05-25SenateCCR adopted
2023-05-24SenateCCR read
2023-05-24HouseTo Senate
2023-05-24HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2023-05-24HouseCCR adopted
2023-05-19HouseTitle restored
2023-05-19HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Stanley
2023-05-19HouseRemove Senator Stanley as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Hamilton
2023-05-19HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Rosecrants
2023-05-19HouseCCR submitted
2023-05-18SenateConference granted, SCs named Stanley, Pugh, Seifried, Green, Murdock, Thompson (Kristen), Hicks
2023-05-18HouseHC's named: Conference Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
2023-05-08HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
2023-05-01HouseSA's received
2023-05-01SenateEngrossed to House
2023-04-27SenateCoauthored by Representative Wolfley
2023-04-27SenateReferred for engrossment
2023-04-27SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2023-04-27SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2023-04-26SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Josh)
2023-04-26Senateremove as principal author Representative West (Josh) and substitute with Representative Miller
2023-04-17SenatePlaced on General Order
2023-04-17SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations committee
2023-04-04SenateReferred to Appropriations
2023-04-04SenateTitle stricken
2023-04-04SenateReported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
2023-03-30SenateSecond Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2023-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-09HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-08HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-08HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
2023-03-08HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Roberts
2023-03-08HouseGeneral Order
2023-02-22HouseAuthored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
2023-02-22HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Steagall
2023-02-22HouseCR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
2023-02-14HouseReferred to Veterans and Military Affairs
2023-02-14HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2023-02-13HouseRemove Representative Steagall as principal House author and substitute with Representative West (Josh)
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Steagall
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2663 (Carry Over) 2023-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2023

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2663&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB2663%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB2663%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB2663%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/HB2663%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2663%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/hB/HB2663%20ENR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2663%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/HB2663%20ENGR%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2663%20CCR%20A%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2663_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2663_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback