OK HB2663 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB2663

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Elections; modifying days in which registered voters may apply for in-person absentee ballot; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; modifying days in which registered voters may apply for in-person absentee ballot; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11HouseApproved by Governor 05/11/2021
2021-05-10HouseSent to Governor
2021-05-10SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2021-05-10HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2021-05-06HouseReferred for enrollment
2021-05-06HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 3
2021-05-06HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Pittman
2021-05-06HouseSA's read, adopted
2021-05-06HouseRejection of SA's and request for conference rescinded
2021-05-05HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Elections and Ethics
2021-04-26HouseSA's received
2021-04-26SenateEngrossed to House
2021-04-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-04-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2
2021-04-22SenateTitle restored
2021-04-22SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2021-04-22SenateCoauthored by Senator Kirt
2021-03-24SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
2021-03-22SenateCoauthored by Representative Davis
2021-03-17SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2021-03-10SenateCoauthored by Representative Dollens
2021-03-10SenateCoauthored by Representative Virgin
2021-03-10SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-10HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-09HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-09HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 6
2021-03-09HouseTitle stricken
2021-03-09HouseAmended
2021-03-09HouseAuthored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
2021-03-09HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-16HouseCR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Echols
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2663 (Carry Over) 2021-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2021

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2663&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB2663%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB2663%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB2663%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB2663%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB2663%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2663%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/hB/HB2663%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2663%20FA1%20ECHOLSJO-CC.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB2663%20PCS.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB2663%20(4-20-21)%20(DAVID)%20RT%20FA1.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB2663%20(4-21-21)%20(DAVID)%20FS%20FA2.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2663%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB2663%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB2663%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2663%20SAHB%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2663_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2663_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback