OK HB2661 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB2661

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Vetoed 04/26/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Personnel Act; leave benefits; allowing temporary increase of certain accumulation limits and carryover; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Personnel Act; leave benefits; allowing temporary increase of certain accumulation limits and carryover; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-26HouseVetoed 04/26/2023
2023-04-20HouseSent to Governor
2023-04-20SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2023-04-20HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2023-04-19HouseReferred for enrollment
2023-04-19SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2023-04-19SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10
2023-04-19SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2023-04-13SenateReported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
2023-03-30SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2023-03-20SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-20HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
2023-03-14HouseAuthored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
2023-03-14HouseGeneral Order
2023-03-02HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Steagall
2023-03-02HouseCR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2023-02-23HouseRemove Representative Steagall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Maynard
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Steagall
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2661 (Carry Over) 2023-04-26 - Vetoed 04/26/2023

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2661&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB2661%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB2661%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB2661%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/HB2661%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/hB/HB2661%20ENR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2661%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2661_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2661_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback