OK HB2656 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2656
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; modifying exception to certain defined term; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; modifying exception to certain defined term; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Zack Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-21 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 5 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2021-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-08 | House | General Order |
2021-02-16 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2656 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021