OK HB2655 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2655
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers; Minority Teacher Recruitment Advisory Committee; deleting committee; creating an advisory consortium; effective date; emergency.
Title
Teachers; Minority Teacher Recruitment Advisory Committee; deleting committee; creating an advisory consortium; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 2 |
2019-03-13 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-27 | House | Emergency added |
2019-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Common Education |
2019-02-25 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Pittman |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2655 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee