OK HB2654 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oil and gas; enacting the Energy Litigation Reform Act; effective date; emergency.
Title
Oil and gas; enacting the Energy Litigation Reform Act; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Rep. Marian Cooksey [R] | Sen. Rob Johnson [R] | Rep. Fred Jordan [R] |
Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Approved by Governor 05/08/2012 | |
2012-05-03 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-01 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-01 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cooksey | |
2012-05-01 | SA's read, adopted | |
2012-04-17 | SA's received | |
2012-04-17 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-16 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-16 | Emergency added | |
2012-04-16 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2012-04-09 | coauthored by Shortey | |
2012-04-09 | Title restored | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading | |
2012-03-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 11 | |
2012-03-15 | Title stricken | |
2012-03-15 | Amended | |
2012-03-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Billy | |
2012-03-15 | General Order | |
2012-02-29 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-29 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Jordan | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
52 | 318 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
52 | 318 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
52 | 318 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
52 | 87 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |