OK HB2652 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Criminal procedure; creating the Oklahoma Innocence Collaboration Program; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; creating the Oklahoma Innocence Collaboration Program; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-25 Died in conference
2012-05-07 Conference granted, GCCA
2012-05-02 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
2012-04-30 SA's received
2012-04-30 Engrossed to House
2012-04-25 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-25 Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2012-04-25 coauthored by Johnson (Constance)
2012-04-25 Senate Rule suspended
2012-04-25 General Order, Amended
2012-04-09 Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2012-03-28 Referred to Appropriations
2012-03-28 Title stricken
2012-03-28 Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
2012-03-15 Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2012-03-08 First Reading
2012-03-08 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-03-07 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-07 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2012-03-07 Coauthored by Representative(s) Billy, McDaniel (Jeannie), Shelton, Nollan
2012-03-07 General Order
2012-02-29 Authored by Senator Halligan (principal Senate author)
2012-02-29 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2012-02-06 Authored by Representative Denney
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2213731Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2213732Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback