OK HB2651 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2651
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; bottle service; definitions; certain license authorities; exception to prohibited acts; effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; bottle service; definitions; certain license authorities; exception to prohibited acts; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 9 |
2019-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis |
2019-03-11 | House | General Order |
2019-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Young (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Pittman |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2651 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism