OK HB2651 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; commercial driver license training; human trafficking; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; commercial driver license training; human trafficking; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Vaughan [R] | Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Approved by Governor 04/18/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-12 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-11 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-06 | House | General Order |
2018-02-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze |
2018-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2018-02-12 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2018-02-12 | House | Withdrawn from Banking and Business Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking and Business |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Vaughan |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |