OK HB2649 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2649
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Durable medical equipment; Oklahoma Durable Medical Equipment Licensing Act; licensing; State Board of Pharmacy; effective date.
Title
Durable medical equipment; Oklahoma Durable Medical Equipment Licensing Act; licensing; State Board of Pharmacy; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Business and Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Business and Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | House | Approved by Governor 05/20/2022 |
2022-05-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-16 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 4 |
2022-05-16 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2022-05-02 | House | SA's received |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stephens |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-04-28 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dugger |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Dugger; authored by Senator Garvin |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Dugger (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-09 | House | General Order |
2021-02-03 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2649 (Carry Over) 2021-03-29 - Referred to Appropriations