OK HB2642 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Placed on General Order
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Children; establishing Oversight Committee on the Delivery of Child Welfare Services; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children; establishing Oversight Committee on the Delivery of Child Welfare Services; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on General Order
2019-04-09SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations committee
2019-04-08SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-04-08SenateReported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-19SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-19HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-02-18HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-02-18HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 4
2019-02-18HouseAuthored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
2019-02-18HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Munson, Lawson
2019-02-18HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-07HouseCR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Baker
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback