OK HB2634 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public safety; Commissioner of Public Safety; allowing employee to return to previous position upon completion of duties as Commissioner; effective date.
Title
Public safety; Commissioner of Public Safety; allowing employee to return to previous position upon completion of duties as Commissioner; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Babinec [R] | Sen. Jack Fry [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Approved by Governor 04/23/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-02-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 17 |
2018-02-15 | House | Authored by Senator Fry (principal Senate author) |
2018-02-15 | House | General Order |
2018-02-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze |
2018-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Babinec |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |