OK HB2632 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2632
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 80-13)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 80-13)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; creating the Patient's Right to Pharmacy Choice Act; establishing a Right to Patient Choice Advisory Committee; effective date.
Title
Insurance; creating the Patient's Right to Pharmacy Choice Act; establishing a Right to Patient Choice Advisory Committee; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Approved by Governor 05/21/2019 |
2019-05-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Quinn |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boren |
2019-05-13 | Senate | coauthored by Provenzano |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Thompson |
2019-05-08 | Senate | CCR read |
2019-05-08 | House | To Senate |
2019-05-08 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert, Moore, Brewer, Ortega |
2019-05-08 | House | CCR adopted |
2019-05-07 | House | Title restored |
2019-05-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Burns, Hardin (David), ODonnell, Johns, Kiger |
2019-05-07 | House | CCR submitted |
2019-05-06 | House | HC's changed: Withdrawn from Conference Committee on Business and Commerce and naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named McCortney, Quinn, Stanislawski, Haste, Brooks, Matthews |
2019-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Business and Commerce |
2019-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-04-18 | Senate | coauthored by Humphrey |
2019-04-18 | Senate | coauthored by Gann |
2019-04-17 | Senate | coauthored by Ford |
2019-04-17 | Senate | coauthored by May |
2019-04-17 | Senate | coauthored by McBride |
2019-04-17 | Senate | coauthored by West (Kevin) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | coauthored by Dollens |
2019-04-17 | Senate | coauthored by Grego |
2019-04-17 | Senate | coauthored by Manger |
2019-04-17 | Senate | coauthored by Caldwell (Trey) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | coauthored by Randleman |
2019-04-17 | Senate | coauthored by Sims |
2019-04-17 | Senate | coauthored by Lawson |
2019-04-17 | Senate | coauthored by Sneed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | coauthored by Cornwell |
2019-04-17 | Senate | coauthored by Sterling |
2019-04-17 | Senate | coauthored by Boatman |
2019-04-16 | Senate | coauthored by Munson |
2019-04-16 | Senate | coauthored by Perryman |
2019-04-15 | Senate | coauthored by Taylor |
2019-04-15 | Senate | coauthored by Dills |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Ikley-Freeman |
2019-04-09 | Senate | coauthored by West (Tammy) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | coauthored by Newton |
2019-04-08 | Senate | coauthored by Frix |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dugger |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Sharp |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dossett |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Paxton |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stanislawski |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rosino |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Matthews |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jech |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Smalley |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Allen |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Leewright |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Weaver |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rader |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Shaw |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boggs |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Standridge |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Scott |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pederson |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Simpson |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stanley |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Montgomery |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kidd |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Coleman |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Silk |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Murdock |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hicks |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dahm |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Haste |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pemberton |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Fugate |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Strom |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | Amended |
2019-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sanders, Patzkowsky, West (Josh), Townley, Pae, Boles, Hasenbeck, Davis, Roberts (Sean), Phillips, Talley, Stark, Roe, McDugle, Vancuren, Virgin, Bell |
2019-03-11 | House | General Order |
2019-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire, Roberts (Dustin) |
2019-03-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Business and Commerce |
2019-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2632 (Carry Over) 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2019