OK HB2631 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; modifying powers and duties of the Director of the Department of Corrections; removing qualifications for wardens; allowing Director to enter into contracts with media or film production companies; effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; modifying powers and duties of the Director of the Department of Corrections; removing qualifications for wardens; allowing Director to enter into contracts with media or film production companies; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 55 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 24 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 55 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 24 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-05-03 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2018-05-03 | Senate | CCR read |
2018-05-03 | House | To Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 27 |
2018-05-03 | House | CCR adopted |
2018-05-02 | House | CCR submitted |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Bergstrom, Fry, Brecheen, Dugger, Jech, Brooks, Matthews |
2018-04-27 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety |
2018-04-26 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Fry; authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion expired |
2018-03-08 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Martinez |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 27 |
2018-03-08 | House | General Order |
2018-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Fry (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Babinec |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |