OK HB2630 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2630
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic violence; modifying list of persons specified in certain criminal offenses; effective date.
Title
Domestic violence; modifying list of persons specified in certain criminal offenses; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 4 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hasenbeck |
2019-03-11 | House | General Order |
2019-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2630 (Carry Over) 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019