OK HB2628 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Industrial hemp; modifying authorization of licensee; removing penalty exception; removing disposal method requirement; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial hemp; modifying authorization of licensee; removing penalty exception; removing disposal method requirement; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseApproved by Governor 05/28/2019
2019-05-22HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-22SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-22HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-22HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-22SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2019-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-15SenateCCR read
2019-05-15HouseTo Senate
2019-05-15HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
2019-05-15HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-14HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Grego
2019-05-14HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-02SenateConference granted, SCs named Paxton, Murdock, Leewright, Allen, Boren, Dossett
2019-05-01HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
2019-04-29HouseSA's received
2019-04-29SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2019-04-25SenateEmergency added
2019-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-04-01SenateReported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
2019-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2019-03-12HouseAuthored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
2019-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-18HouseCR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Echols
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2628&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2628%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2628%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2628%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2628%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2628%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB2628%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB2628%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2628_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2628_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback