OK HB2624 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey, Ritze
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Public health and safety; requiring health care facility to grant religious exemption to employees who object to immunization; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; requiring health care facility to grant religious exemption to employees who object to immunization; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Murphey, Ritze
2018-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
2018-02-12HouseReferred to Public Health
2018-02-12HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative West (Kevin)
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback