OK HB2623 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Officers; retirement benefit forfeiture; administrators and teachers of common school districts.
Title
Officers; retirement benefit forfeiture; administrators and teachers of common school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Approved by Governor 04/16/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-10 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-10 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-09 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-09 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-02 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-07 | Emergency removed | |
2012-03-07 | Amended | |
2012-03-07 | General Order | |
2012-02-09 | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-09 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative McDaniel (Randy) | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 24 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 17 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |