OK HB2622 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Correctional officers; providing wage increase for certain correctional officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional officers; providing wage increase for certain correctional officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseDied in conference
2019-05-02SenateConference granted, GCCA
2019-04-29HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
2019-04-25HouseSA's received
2019-04-25SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-24SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-24SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2019-04-24SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-10SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-04-10SenateEnacting clause stricken
2019-04-10SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2019-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative CrosswhiteHader
2019-03-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-06HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-05HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-05HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0
2019-03-05HouseAuthored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author)
2019-03-05HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Echols
2019-03-05HouseRemove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Humphrey
2019-03-05HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-14HouseTitle stricken
2019-02-14HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McCall, O'Donnell, Russ
2019-02-14HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Echols
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2622&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2622%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2622%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2622%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2622%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2622%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2622%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2622_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2622_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback