OK HB2618 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2618
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State government; websites of public bodies; requiring posting of certain information on website; effective date.
Title
State government; websites of public bodies; requiring posting of certain information on website; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Rob Standridge [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Tom Gann [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by Governor 04/30/2019 |
2019-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Gann |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-05 | House | General Order |
2019-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Efficiency Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2618 (Carry Over) 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019