OK HB2615 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
Pending: Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
Pending: Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Definitions and general provisions; creating A Day of Remembrance; effective date.
Title
Definitions and general provisions; creating A Day of Remembrance; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-12 | House | Amended |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Shaw (principal Senate author) |
2018-02-27 | House | Remove Representative Fourkiller as principal House author and substitute with Representative Condit |
2018-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-02-12 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Fourkiller |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |