OK HB2613 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Medical marijuana; providing definition for the term physician; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical marijuana; providing definition for the term physician; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseApproved by Governor 05/15/2019
2019-05-09HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-09SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-09HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-08HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-08HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 9
2019-05-08HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-29HouseSA's received
2019-04-29SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7
2019-04-25SenateEmergency clause restored
2019-04-25SenateTitle restored
2019-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-04-01SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-04-01SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-01SenateReported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13HouseEmergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 1
2019-03-13HouseRecalled from engrossment
2019-03-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 1
2019-03-13HouseEmergency added
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-13HouseAuthored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
2019-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Echols
2019-02-28HouseRemove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Fetgatter
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Echols
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2613&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2613%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2613%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2613%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2613%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2613%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2613%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB2613%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2613_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2613_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback