OK HB2610 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2610
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children; child abuse examiners; directing the Commission on Children and Youth to promulgate rules for child abuse medical examiners; effective date; emergency.
Title
Children; child abuse examiners; directing the Commission on Children and Youth to promulgate rules for child abuse medical examiners; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: ADVANCE (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | Emergency added |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2610 (Carry Over) 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019