OK HB2605 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-22 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Counties and county officers; county clerks; authorizing clerk to provide records by electronic means; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Counties and county officers; county clerks; authorizing clerk to provide records by electronic means; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-21 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 23 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-22 Enacting clause restored
2012-05-22 Emergency added
2012-05-22 Title restored
2012-05-22 CCR submitted
2012-05-09 Conference granted, SCs named Marlatt, Aldridge, Brinkley, Treat, Ballenger, Lerblance
2012-05-02 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules
2012-04-30 SA's received
2012-04-30 Engrossed to House
2012-04-25 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-25 Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2012-04-25 General Order, Considered
2012-04-02 Enacting clause stricken
2012-04-02 Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
2012-03-15 Second Reading referred to General Government
2012-03-13 First Reading
2012-03-13 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-03-12 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-12 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
2012-03-12 Title stricken
2012-03-12 Ayes: 73 Nays: 0
2012-03-12 Amended
2012-03-12 General Order
2012-03-05 Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author)
2012-03-05 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
2012-02-06 Authored by Representative Blackwell
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback