OK HB2601 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Marijuana; prohibiting marijuana smoking and vaping in public places; licensing requirements and restrictions for medical marijuana license holders and caregivers; banking and finance standards; business restrictions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marijuana; prohibiting marijuana smoking and vaping in public places; licensing requirements and restrictions for medical marijuana license holders and caregivers; banking and finance standards; business restrictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenateCCR read
2019-05-20HouseTo Senate
2019-05-20HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 1
2019-05-20HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-16HouseTitle restored
2019-05-16HouseRemove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Fetgatter
2019-05-16HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-07SenateConference granted, SCs named McCortney, Smalley, Daniels, Pugh, Ikley-Freeman, Young
2019-05-02HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules
2019-04-29HouseSA's received
2019-04-29SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3
2019-04-25SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-04-25SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-04-01SenateReported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3
2019-03-13HouseEmergency added
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-13HouseAuthored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
2019-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Echols
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2601&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2601%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2601%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2601%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2601%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2601%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2601%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB2601%20CCS.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2601_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2601_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback