OK HB2587 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2587
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health care; creating the Nondiscrimination in Health Care Coverage Act; effective date.
Title
Health care; creating the Nondiscrimination in Health Care Coverage Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Approved by Governor 05/21/2020 |
2020-05-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2020-05-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2020-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 21 |
2020-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak |
2020-03-10 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2020-02-17 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean) |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2587 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - Second Reading referred to Rules