OK HB2585 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
Pending: Senate Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
Pending: Senate Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; prohibiting disqualification of license for certain convictions; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; prohibiting disqualification of license for certain convictions; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Rep. Mike Shelton [D] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
Rep. Mark McCullough [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Business, Labor and Retirement Laws Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Business, Labor and Retirement Laws Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Shelton |
2016-03-10 | House | Motion expired |
2016-03-08 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Lepak |
2016-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 31 |
2016-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Shaw (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McCullough |
2016-03-08 | House | General Order |
2016-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Business, Labor and Retirement Laws Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Labor and Retirement Laws |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Lepak |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |