OK HB2579 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Agriculture; emergency drought conditions; modifying definition of extreme fire danger; effective date.
Title
Agriculture; emergency drought conditions; modifying definition of extreme fire danger; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Don Barrington [R] | Sen. Rick Brinkley [R] | Rep. Charles Joyner [R] | Rep. Glen Mulready [R] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Died in conference | |
2012-05-07 | Conference granted, SCs named Brinkley, Fields, Barrington, Crain, Eason McIntyre, Ballenger | |
2012-05-02 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Natural Resources | |
2012-04-18 | SA's received | |
2012-04-18 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-17 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-17 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-03 | coauthored by Barrington | |
2012-04-03 | coauthored by Joyner | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2012-02-15 | First Reading | |
2012-02-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-14 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2012-02-14 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Ritze | |
2012-02-14 | General Order | |
2012-02-08 | Authored by Senator Brinkley (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-08 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Mulready | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |