OK HB2578 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State government; creating the Aerospace Commerce Economic Services (ACES) Act; effective date.
Title
State government; creating the Aerospace Commerce Economic Services (ACES) Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 53 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: ADVANCE THE QUESTION (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 52 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: ADVANCE THE QUESTION (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 52 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-05-03 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 33 |
2018-05-03 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2018-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 4 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stanislawski |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Floyd |
2018-04-26 | Senate | General Order, considered and deferred |
2018-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Simpson |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dugger |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Leewright |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Scott |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kidd |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pugh |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 33 |
2018-03-14 | House | Title stricken |
2018-03-14 | House | Amended |
2018-03-14 | House | General Order |
2018-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Fry |
2018-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) |
2018-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking and Business Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking and Business |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Teague |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |