OK HB2575 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; providing alternative method to obtain salvage title; effective date; emergency.
Title
Motor vehicles; providing alternative method to obtain salvage title; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. David Holt [R] | Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Approved by Governor 04/27/2012 | |
2012-04-23 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-23 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-23 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-19 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-19 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-19 | Title restored | |
2012-04-19 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-03-21 | Title stricken | |
2012-03-21 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2012-03-06 | First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-05 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-05 | General Order | |
2012-02-29 | Authored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-29 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Ownbey | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |