OK HB2572 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 54
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 54
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Landlord and tenant; requiring certain owners to ensure anchoring of certain homes; effective date.
Title
Landlord and tenant; requiring certain owners to ensure anchoring of certain homes; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] | Sen. Frank Simpson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 59 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 54 | |
2012-03-06 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 59 Nays: 24 | |
2012-03-01 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Ownbey | |
2012-03-01 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 43 | |
2012-03-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman | |
2012-03-01 | General Order | |
2012-02-23 | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Ownbey | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |