OK HB2571 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2571
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; physical therapists; modifying powers and duties of the State Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision; background checks; emergency.
Title
Professions and occupations; physical therapists; modifying powers and duties of the State Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision; background checks; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-27 | House | Emergency added |
2019-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-21 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean) |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2571 (Carry Over) 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019